HI SB2641 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for residential programs that allow minor children to remain with their mothers while participating in the program, to reduce the risk of trauma and multigenerational incarceration, including communitybased furlough programs, residential drug treatment programs, therapeutic community programs, and mental health programs. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Judiciary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 104-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 104-22). |
2022-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ichiyama, B. Kobayashi, Ganaden, Morikawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Shimabukuro, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 2:30PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-22 2:30PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 894). |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Acasio, Fevella. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ohno, Ichiyama, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Ganaden, Morikawa, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 475). |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1773-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-31 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Holt, McDermott. |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1326-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1100-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-16 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, McDermott. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 279) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2860) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2143) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1780 (Same As) 2022-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).