HI HB1780 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for residential programs that allow minor children to remain with their mothers, to reduce the risk of trauma and multigenerational incarceration, including communitybased furlough programs, residential drug treatment programs, therapeutic community programs, and mental health programs. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Judiciary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-04 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 127-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-04 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Friday, 02-04-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2641 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Budget
Community-Based Furlough Programs
Judiciary
Residential Drug Treatment
Women's Legislative Caucus
Budget
Community-Based Furlough Programs
Judiciary
Residential Drug Treatment
Women's Legislative Caucus