HI SB2504 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the offense of obstructing includes providing less than one meter of space for passage on any paved public sidewalk, except as authorized by law.
Title
Obstruction of Public Passage; Sidewalks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1660 (Same As) 2014-04-25 - Act 051, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1151).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2504&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2504_.HTM |