HI HB1660 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 051, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1151).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Act 051, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1151).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the offense of obstructing includes, in addition to obstructing a highway or public passage, providing less than thirty-six inches of space for passage on any paved public sidewalk, except as authorized by law, or failing to obey a law enforcement officer's order or request to cease any of the foregoing activities. (SD1)
Title
Obstruction of Public Passage; Sidewalks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Act 051, 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1151). |
2014-04-25 | House | Act 051, on 4/23/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1151). |
2014-04-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 688). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-14 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with Representative(s) Aquino, McKelvey, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Awana, Carroll, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Kawakami, Matsumoto, McDermott, Tokioka, Ward, Yamane voting no (14) and Representative(s) Ing, Oshiro excused (2). |
2014-04-14 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 681). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Hee Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Galuteria Member. |
2014-04-11 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-04-14. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 504). |
2014-04-04 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 487) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Slom). Excused, 1 (Kidani). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-03-14. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3161) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Shimabukuro ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 03-20-14 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 16). |
2014-02-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aquino, Awana, Cullen, Fale, Fukumoto, Har, Kawakami, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan, Oshiro, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Har, Jordan, Oshiro, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1). |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 61-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2014-01-28 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Creagan, Nakashima, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, Ito, Kawakami, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2014-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 01-28-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-15 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2014-01-14 | House | Prefiled |