CO HB1227 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning implementation of the committee on legal services' recommendations in connection with legislative review of state agencies' rules.
Title
Annual Rule Review Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Joint - Committee on Legal Services: Refer House Bill 24-1227 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Joint - Committee on Legal Services: Refer House Bill 24-1227, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Joint - Committee on Legal Services: Refer House Bill 24-1227, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Joint - Committee on Legal Services: Refer House Bill 24-1227 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Joint - Committee on Legal Services: Refer House Bill 24-1227, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Joint - Committee on Legal Services: Refer House Bill 24-1227, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Legal Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Legal Services |
2024-02-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee on Legal Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Legal Services |