HI SB2405 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to HEA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to HEA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the University of Hawaii college of tropical agriculture and human resources for the restoration and preservation of historic relief maps of the Hawaiian islands.
Title
University of Hawaii; Historic Relief Maps ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HEA, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1824 (Same As) 2016-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tupola excused (1).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2405&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2405_.HTM |