HI SB2336 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - (S) The committee(s) on TIA/CPN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-12 1:00PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - (S) The committee(s) on TIA/CPN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-12 1:00PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes rental motor vehicle lessors to collect a vehicle license cost recovery fee from lessees. Defines "vehicle license cost recovery fee."
Title
Motor Vehicle Rental; Vehicle License Cost Recovery Fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA/CPN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-10-12 1:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-12 1:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to TIA/CPN, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2336 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2336_.HTM |