HI SB2298 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the penalty for employers who fail to pay the wages of their employees in accordance with the State's wage and hour law and payment of wages and other compensation law, to a class C felony. Adds a minimum penalty of $500 per violation. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Wages.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 110-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 110-22). |
2022-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Rhoads, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-22 10:01AM; Conference Room 224. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Sayama Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Rhoads, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2022-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 866). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 536). |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Wildberger voting no (1) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1852-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Wildberger; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Branco, McDermott. |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Wildberger voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1391-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 187) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2993) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2458) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |