HI SB2296 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning with the primary election in an unspecified year, requires the office of elections to implement elections by mail. Thereafter requires all federal, state, and county primary, special primary, general, special general, and special elections to be conducted by mail. Beginning on an unspecified date, establishes a minimum number of voter service centers per county and island, in lieu of traditional polling places. Requires voter service centers to provide services such as voter registration at least ten working days through the day before election day. Repeals election day voter registration at polling places, which was to take effect on January 1, 2018. Appropriates funds.
Title
Elections; Voting; Elections by Mail; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDL/PSM, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2152 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2296&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2296_.HTM |