HI SB2258 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits duration of cellular phone service contracts to one year. Allows renewals thereafter in one-year increments.
Title
Cellular Phone Service Contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee on EDT deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-10-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-12 2:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to EDT, CPN. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2258 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB2258_.HTM |