HI SB2211 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of youth services to coordinate a five-year safe places for youth pilot program to establish a network of safe places where youth can access safety and services. Establishes the position of safe places for youth program coordinator. Allows youth in crisis under 18 years of age to consent to services in the safe places program. Makes an appropriation. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB2211 HD2)
Title
Office of Youth Services; Safe Places for Youth Pilot Program; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1211-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima, Wooley. |
2014-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-20-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4). |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 957-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-03-11 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Morikawa, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Woodson. |
2014-03-10 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 03-11-14 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 120) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2726) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2343) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 01-27-14 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-25-14 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1790 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3