HI SB2135 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the position of a school liaison officer within the Hawaii National Guard and provides for and appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii National Guard; School Liaison
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Bunda [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Reported from PSM/EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2148) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Bunda, English, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tsutsui, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-04-10 2:00pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH deferred the measure until 02-03-10 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM/EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-10 1:15pm in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Referred to PSM/EDH, WAM. | |
2010-01-20 | (S) Introduced and passed First Reading. |