HI SB2131 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Board of Regents of the University of Hawaii to waive the nonresident tuition and fee differential for veterans of the United States armed forces who were honorably discharged and who meet certain conditions, beginning with the 2014-2015 academic year. Effective July 1, 2525, unless the Board of Regents adopts specific parameters and conditions for tuition and fee waivers for veterans by August 1, 2014. (SB2131 HD2)
Title
University of Hawaii System; Veterans; Residency; Tuition; Waiver
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1117-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-18 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Ohno, Say, Takumi, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takai. |
2014-03-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-18-14 2:34PM in House conference room 309. |
2014-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4). |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 964-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2014-03-12 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, McDermott. |
2014-03-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 03-12-14 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to VMI, HED, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 107) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2610) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2330) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Slom. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |