HI SB1459 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1387).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1387).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the temporary State Commission on Surfing. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The State Surfing Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1387). |
2019-07-09 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1387). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202) |
2019-06-24 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 107) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 107). |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Cullen, Gates, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 9:50AM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 11:00AM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 11:00AM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 12:35PM in conference room 224. |
2019-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 907). |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Taniguchi, Kidani Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Gates, Matsumoto. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 569). |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 04-03-19. |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1921) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nishimoto, Todd. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1553) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 488) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1097) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-26-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-22-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-21-19 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-20-19 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 422) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |