HI SB144 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes a grant-in aid to the counties for drought mitigation purposes.
Title
Drought Mitigation; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Reported from PGM/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 142) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to PGM/WLH, WAM. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |