HI SB1413 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1413

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the governor, lieutenant governor, state legislators, and heads of principal departments to prominently display a Hawaiian language translation of the name of their respective office or department at least once on the main page of their official website and in the letterhead of their stationery. Requires all letterheads, documents, state highway signs, symbols, and emblems of the State and other political subdivisions that include Hawaiian names or words to include consistent Hawaiian names, spelling, and punctuation, including the use of kahako and okina. Establishes references for consistent Hawaiian names and words, including consistent Hawaiian spelling and punctuation. Clarifies that the full text of bills and other official documents are not required to be written in Hawaiian and that inconsistently spelled or punctuated Hawaiian words and names shall not invalidate the documents or render them unenforceable and no cause of action shall arise accordingly. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaiian Language.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1086) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-03-17HouseThe committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-23HouseReferred to CAI, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17
2021-02-23HousePass First Reading
2021-02-22HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 53) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-02-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-02-19Senate48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21.
2021-02-19SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 574) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
2021-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-12SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 193) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-04SenateRe-Referred to HWN, WAM.
2021-02-01SenateReferred to HWN/GVO, WAM.
2021-01-29SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1357 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1413 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback