HI SB1396 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1396
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the transfer and co-management of certain agricultural lands between the department of agriculture and department of land and natural resources as identified in Act 90, Session Laws of Hawaii 2003.
Title
Relating To Agricultural Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1396 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1396&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB1396_.HTM |