HI SB1313 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Act 038, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Act 038, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enables the board of trustees of the Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund to establish appropriate salaries for the Administrator and Chief Investment Officer of the Trust Fund. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-28 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Act 038, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138). |
2023-06-01 | House | Act 038, on 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1138). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 900). |
2023-05-02 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 993). |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 114) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 114). |
2023-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-23 10:35AM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-27-23 10:35AM; Conference Room 016. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 868). |
2023-04-24 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Garrett Co-Chairs; Alcos. |
2023-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 932). |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Kim Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2023-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 882). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 708). |
2023-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2060), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-31 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Poepoe, Alcos. |
2023-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-31-23 3:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Perruso excused (1). |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1251) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-03-14 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 03-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-02-17 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-02-16 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 15) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Lee). Transmitted to House. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-16-23. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 355) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Wakai. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-10-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 68) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Keith-Agaran. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1015 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3