HI SB1245 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1245
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a moratorium on the construction of any new correctional facilities in the State on or after 7/1/2021, including the planned construction of a new facility to replace the existing Oahu community correctional center. Prohibits the construction of new correctional facilities or the expansion of existing correctional facilities without the approval of the Hawaii correctional system oversight commission.
Title
Relating To Correctional Facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, WAM/JDC. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1245 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM/JDC.
HB1082 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har, Holt, Okimoto, Quinlan, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
HB1082 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har, Holt, Okimoto, Quinlan, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1245&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1245_.HTM |