HI SB1219 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1219
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the sunset provision in Act 39, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, to 6/30/2024. Takes effect 6/29/2021. (SD1)
Title
Relating To University Of Hawaii Research.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-04-21 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE, JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 256) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:10PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HRE, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1219 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
HB1065 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to HRE, JDC/WAM.
HB1065 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to HRE, JDC/WAM.