HI HB1065 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1065
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to HRE, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to HRE, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the innovation and commercialization initiative program permanent by repealing the sunset provision in Act 39, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017. Effective July 1, 2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To University Of Hawaii Research.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HRE, JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 90). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 688), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 268) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-10 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, DeCoite, Belatti, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-10-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1065 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to HRE, JDC/WAM.
SB1219 (Same As) 2021-03-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
SB1219 (Same As) 2021-03-04 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.