HI SB1184 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1184
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals section 197-4, Hawaii Revised Statutes, establishing the Aquatic Life and Wildlife Advisory Committees and amends sections 197-1 and 197-2, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to conform with that repeal.
Title
Relating To The Aquatic Life And Wildlife Advisory Committees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1184 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL, JDC.
HB1030 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Act 145, 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247).
HB1030 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - Act 145, 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1184&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB1184_.HTM |