HI HB1030 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Act 145, 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Act 145, 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the aquatic life and wildlife advisory committees and makes conforming amendments. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Aquatic Life And Wildlife Advisory Committees.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | Act 145, 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247). |
2021-07-01 | House | Act 145, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1247). |
2021-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 614). |
2021-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-15-21. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 578). |
2021-04-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nakashima Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 744) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1573) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-21 9:50AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1246) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 276). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 858) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Tokioka. |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 544) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-18 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-18-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1184 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL, JDC.