HI SB1174 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 130, 6/15/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1233).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - (S) Act 130, 6/15/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1233).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires charter school budget requests for needs-based facilities funding to include a detailed explanation as to the formula used and the funding request breakdown by school. Allows charter schools to appeal denied reauthorizations to BOE. Requires charter schools and their local school boards to develop internal policies and procedures consistent with ethical standards of conduct. Requires the charter school review panel to conduct a multi-year evaluation of each charter school every six years, instead of every five. Establishes a task force to address issues on charter school governance, accountability, and authority. (CD1)
Title
Charter Schools; Facilities Funding Formula; Governance; Accountability; Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | (S) Act 130, 6/15/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1233). | |
2011-06-16 | (H) Act 130, on 6/15/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1233). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 109) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-29 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 109). | |
2011-04-29 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 1:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 2:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 2:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 2:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-11 2:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Takumi, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Belatti, M. Lee, Johanson. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 508). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1469), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1107) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Aquino, Awana, Nakashima, Saiki, Takai, Wooley, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Chang, Hanohano, Mizuno, Nishimoto. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-21-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 266) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 700) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fukunaga. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-11 9:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 333) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Taniguchi. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-07-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-02-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |