HI SB1106 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Act 020, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Act 020, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the QUEST and QUEST Expanded Access references in the Hawaii Revised Statutes to remove language that refers to specific programs and replace it with "medicaid managed care". Authorizes all medicaid managed care health plans to subject prescription drugs for conditions covered in section 346-352, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to prior authorization procedures. (SD2)
Title
Medicaid Managed Care Program
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Act 020, on 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120). |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Act 020, 4/23/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1120). |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 440). |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1493), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1021), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-19-15 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 27) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-15. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 548) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-17-15 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 78) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-15 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB937 (Same As) 2015-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1).