HI SB1097 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies section 269-15(a), Hawaii Revised Statutes, so that the Public Utilities Commission may order the Consumer Advocate, rather than the Director of the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs, to appear in regulatory proceedings initiated by the Commission to enforce chapter 269, Hawaii Revised Statutes, and related requirements.
Title
Consumer Advocate; Public Utilities Commission; Violations; Regulatory Proceedings
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 36). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-06-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 568) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kahele, Kidani, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Nishihara. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-15 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB928 (Same As) 2015-04-20 - Act 008, 4/16/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1097&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB1097_.HTM |