HI HR55 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Federal Government To Include Hong Kong In The United States Visa Waiver Program And Ease Visa Restrictions And The Visa Application And Approval Process For Business And Tourist Travelers With Hong Kong Special Administrative Region Passports.
Title
Urges Inclusion of Hong Kong in United States Visa Waiver Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Thielen excused (1). | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from INT/TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1524-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Tokioka, Awana, Choy, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ching. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on INT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Awana, Hashem, Brower, Choy, Evans, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by INT/TOU on Monday, 03-19-12 9:45AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Referred to INT/TOU, referral sheet 42 | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-05 | (H) To be offered. |