HI HR251 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Establish A Sister-state Relationship Through The Hawaii Sister-state Committee Between Hawaii And The Province Of Lima, Peru.
Title
Lima, Peru; Sister-State Relationship
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from INT/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1728) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) The committees on INT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Awana, Hashem, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by INT/ERB on Thursday, 03-31-11 10:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to INT/ERB, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR284 (Same As) 2011-04-19 - (S) Referred to TIA/EDT.