HI HR107 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR107
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Health To Maintain Communications With The Centers For Disease Control And Prevention In Ongoing Efforts To Better Understand And Monitor The Immunization And Vaccination Of Children In Hawaii And Ensure Their Safety.
Title
Encouraging The Department Of Health To Maintain Communications With The Centers For Disease Control And Prevention In Ongoing Efforts To Better Understand And Monitor The Immunization And Vaccination Of Children In Hawaii And Ensure Their Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Andria Tupola [R] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1724-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 03-22-18 9:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR107 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott, McKelvey excused (3).
HCR157 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR157 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).