HI HCR157 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR157

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging The Department Of Health To Maintain Communications With The Centers For Disease Control And Prevention In Ongoing Efforts To Better Understand And Monitor The Immunization And Vaccination Of Children In Hawaii And Ensure Their Safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging The Department Of Health To Maintain Communications With The Centers For Disease Control And Prevention In Ongoing Efforts To Better Understand And Monitor The Immunization And Vaccination Of Children In Hawaii And Ensure Their Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
2018-03-28HouseReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1725-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2018-03-22HouseThe committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2018-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 03-22-18 9:00AM in conference room 329.
2018-03-13HouseReferred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39
2018-03-09HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR107 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR157 (Carry Over) 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback