HI HCR35 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-21 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting A Reevaluation Of The Ala Wai Canal Project Draft Feasibility Study With Integrated Environmental Impact Statement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ala Wai Canal Project; Feasibility Study; EIS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-21HouseThe committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2016-03-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-21-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
2016-02-04HouseReferred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 9
2016-02-04HouseOffered
2016-02-03HouseTo be offered.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback