HI HB982 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB982
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the type of public notice required for reporting the redetermination of the University of Hawaii's allotment ceiling, the state growth rate and expenditure ceiling, and the release of grants.
Title
Relating To Public Notices.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB982 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1208 (Same As) 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to HRE, WAM.
SB1208 (Same As) 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to HRE, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=982&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB982_.HTM |