HI HB982 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Department of Transportation Highways Division to collect an unspecified amount from franchise utility companies for the use of the state right of way. (HB982 HD1)
Title
Department of Transportation; Franchise Utility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Hanohano voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Tokioka excused (2). |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 433) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-02-11 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hashem, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ing; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Monday, 02-11-13 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1213 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.