HI HB89 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Act 059, on 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Act 059, on 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Continues the Hospital Sustainability Program for two years. Increases the cap on the inpatient and outpatient hospital sustainability fees to not more than three and one-half percent of the hospital's net inpatient and outpatient service revenue, respectively. Appropriates $70,000,000 out of the Hospital Sustainability Program Special Fund for Fiscal Years 2017-2018 and 2018-2019. (HB89 CD1)
Title
Relating To The Hospital Sustainability Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Act 059, on 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159). |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Act 059, 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1159). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 20). |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 20) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Belatti, Gates, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-21-17 at 2:00PM in Conference Room 229. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Baker, Taniguchi Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Belatti, Gates Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 547) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1511) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-17 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1020) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Ihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Kidani. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-17 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 80). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 841), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 397) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Har, Kobayashi, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-01-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |