HI HB871 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 4:56PM in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 4:56PM in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii biosecurity program as a function of the entire DOA. Requires DOA to establish or participate in private-public partnerships to enhance the biosecurity program and quarantine inspection process. Appropriates funds for specified projects. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Department of Agriculture; Biosecurity Program; Objectives; General Actions; Program Charges; Private-Public Partnerships; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 at 4:56PM in Conference Room 224. |
2015-05-01 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 05-01-15 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 224. |
2015-04-30 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-29 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-30-15 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Gabbard, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Riviere, Slom. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Onishi Co-Chairs; Cachola, Ohno, Ward. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2015-04-16 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2015-04-14 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 585) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1495) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-07-15 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Reported from AGL/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1079) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee on ENE will reconsider its previous decision made on 3/19/15 and will hold a public decision making on 03-24-15 3:40PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to AGL/ENE, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 89). |
2015-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 647), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Souki excused (2). |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 352) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-12 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-02-11 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-12-15 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2015-01-26 | House | Pending introduction. |