HI HB856 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB856
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to EEP/PVM, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to EEP/PVM, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 10
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism, in coordination with the counties, to identify critical infrastructure locations and ensure those locations have adequate supplies of electricity during and after a natural disaster or during a state of emergency.
Title
Relating To Electric Grid Resiliency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Re-referred to EEP/PVM, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 10 |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to EEP/PVM, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB856 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - Re-referred to EEP/PVM, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 10
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=856&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB856_.HTM |