HI HB785 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the revenues of the land conservation fund from the conveyance tax to be temporarily expended for invasive species control and mitigation, reforestation, and sediment run-off control.
Title
Land Conservation Fund; Purposes of Expenditures
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 432), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-14 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Coffman, Herkes, Ito, Morita, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Riviere; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Chong, Thielen. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO on Monday, 02-14-11 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to WLO, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=785 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB785_.HTM |