HI HB73 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB73
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a licensing authority from using rules to supersede requirements set forth in licensing laws and adopting rules that authorize an unlicensed individual to perform duties, activities, or functions that, if performed by another professional, would require licensure of that professional.
Title
Relating To Professional And Vocational Licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB73 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2
SB774 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).
SB774 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=73&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB73_.HTM |