HI HB73 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB73
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a licensing authority from using rules to supersede requirements set forth in licensing laws and adopting rules that authorize an unlicensed individual to perform duties, activities, or functions that, if performed by another professional, would require licensure of that professional.
Title
Relating To Professional And Vocational Licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB774 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
HB73 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2
HB73 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to IAC, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=73&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB73_.HTM |