HI HB691 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB691
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires UH to provide training on the impacts of trauma for employees responsible for investigating incidents and assisting victims of sexual and domestic violence. Improves access for confidential support services. Requires UH to annually distribute information about sexual and domestic violence prevention and disclosure protocols to students and employees. To the extent possible, requires a private college or university to implement identical campus safety and accountability standards to those applicable to UH.
Title
Relating To Campus Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB691 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - The committee(s) on HET recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB727 (Same As) 2021-02-16 - Re-Referred to JDC.
SB727 (Same As) 2021-02-16 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=691&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB691_.HTM |