HI HB634 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB634
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to open at least one office in each county for claimants wishing to file for unemployment insurance in person. Requires state library employees to minimally assist claimants wishing to file for unemployment insurance using public access computers at the library. Requires the department of labor and industrial relations to hire or reassign staff to increase capacity of processing unemployment insurance claims. Requires the department to complete its computer upgrade and modification project within six months of this Acts passage.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB901 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB634 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB634 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=634&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB634_.HTM |