HI SB901 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB901

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to open at least one office in each county for claimants wishing to file for unemployment insurance in person. Requires state library employees to minimally assist claimants wishing to file for unemployment insurance using public access computers at the library. Requires the department of labor and industrial relations to hire or reassign staff to increase capacity of processing unemployment insurance claims. Requires the department to complete its computer upgrade and modification project within six months of this Acts passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to LCA/EDU, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB634 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB901 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to LCA/EDU, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback