HI HB60 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the $0.66 monthly surcharge on wireless telephone accounts and terminates the wireless enhanced 911 fund once all moneys in the fund are expended. Effective 7/1/2011.
Title
Wireless Enhanced 911; Surcharge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to PBM, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB783 (Same As) 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=60 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB60_.HTM |