HI HB60 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-24 - (H) Referred to PBM, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Public Safety & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-24 - (H) Referred to PBM, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Public Safety & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the $0.66 monthly surcharge on wireless telephone accounts and terminates the wireless enhanced 911 fund once all moneys in the fund are expended. Effective 7/1/2011.
Title
Wireless Enhanced 911; Surcharge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to PBM, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB783 (Same As) 2011-02-10 - (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=60 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB60_.HTM |