HI HB587 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 251, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1354).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act 251, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1354).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the penal code to include persons in a dating relationship as family or household members for purposes of prohibiting physical abuse of family or household members. Increases the period of separation from twenty-four to forty-eight hours that a police officer is required to order a person to stay away from a family or household member if the police officer has reasonable grounds to believe that a family or household member is in probable danger of further physical abuse or harm being inflicted by the person. (HB587 CD1)
Title
Penal Code; Abuse of Family or Household Members; No Contact Orders
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] |
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Act 251, 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1354). |
2013-07-09 | House | Act 251, on 7/1/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1354). |
2013-05-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 27). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 27) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Har, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 1:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-18-13 4:00PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Shimabukuro, Co-Chair(s); Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Kawakami Chair; Har, Thielen. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 504) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1330) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 240). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 728) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Rhoads, Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Wooley. |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-26-13 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |