HI HB551 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB551
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment that guarantees individuals the right to a clean and healthy environment, including pure water, clean air, healthy ecosystems, and a stable climate, and to the preservation of the natural, cultural, scenic and healthful qualities of the environment. Clarifies that the rights guaranteed may not be diminished by Article XI, Section 9, of the State Constitution. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article I Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Guarantee All Individuals The Right To Have A Clean And Healthy Environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-12 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3). |
2021-02-12 | House | Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 248) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Morikawa; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, McDermott. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-02-05 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 02-11-21 10:45AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB502 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB551 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
HB551 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).