HI SB502 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB502

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes a constitutional amendment that guarantees individuals the right to a clean and healthy environment, including pure water, clean air, and healthy ecosystems, and to the preservation of the natural, cultural, scenic, and healthful qualities of the environment. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing An Amendment To Article I Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Guarantee All Individuals The Right To Have A Clean And Healthy Environment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0).
2021-03-18HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1006) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-03-16HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-12HouseRe-referred to EEP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 23
2021-03-11HouseReferred to EEP/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-11SenateNotice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 2).
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 222) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Inouye, Keohokalole, Kidani, Kim, Moriwaki, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-04SenateReported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 637) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kidani, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
2021-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2021-02-08SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 28) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2021-02-03SenateRe-Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM.
2021-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to AEN, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB551 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB502 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback