HI SB502 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB502
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment that guarantees individuals the right to a clean and healthy environment, including pure water, clean air, and healthy ecosystems, and to the preservation of the natural, cultural, scenic, and healthful qualities of the environment. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article I Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Guarantee All Individuals The Right To Have A Clean And Healthy Environment.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1006) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | House | Re-referred to EEP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 2). |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 222) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Inouye, Keohokalole, Kidani, Kim, Moriwaki, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 637) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Kidani, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 28) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB502 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto voting no (2) and none excused (0).
HB551 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
HB551 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).