HI HB551 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes a constitutional amendment that guarantees individuals the right to a clean and healthy environment, including pure water, clean air, healthy ecosystems, and a stable climate, and to the preservation of the natural, cultural, scenic and healthful qualities of the environment. Clarifies that the rights guaranteed may not be diminished by Article XI, Section 9, of the State Constitution. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing An Amendment To Article I Of The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Guarantee All Individuals The Right To Have A Clean And Healthy Environment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
2021-02-12HouseReported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 248) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Morikawa; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, McDermott.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2021-02-05HouseBill re-scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 02-11-21 10:45AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to EEP/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB502 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback