HI HB536 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 223, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 223, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies preference in state low-income housing for disabled veterans. Authorizes the Hawaii Public Housing Authority to disqualify any applicant or tenant from state low-income housing if the applicant, tenant, or a household member owns or acquires a home within the State. (HB536 CD1)
Title
Public Housing Authority; Home Ownership; Eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 223, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326). |
2013-07-02 | House | Act 223, on 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1326). |
2013-05-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey, Morikawa voting no (2) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 101). |
2013-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 101) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kouchi, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Slom. |
2013-04-26 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 10:00AM in Conference Room 229. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 3:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 3:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 3:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Green, Kouchi, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Cabanilla, Woodson Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Ward. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 501) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1402) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 950) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 1:20PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 236). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 792) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 10), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-01-28 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Belatti, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2013-01-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 01-28-13 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |